SYAC LTD

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
TO PROMOTE THE ADVANCEMENT OF BLACK AND ETHNIC MINORITIES AND OTHER COMMUNITIES IN THE SETTING UP OF BUSINESSES WITHIN THE GEOGRAPHICAL AREAS OF SHEFFIELD.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

7 Trustee(s)
2 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Sheffield City
Governance
- 09 September 2008: Standard registration
- SOUTH YORKSHIRE AFRICAN CARIBBEAN BUSINESS AND ENTERPRISE TRAINING CENTRE LIMITED (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MICHAEL EDGAR ATKINS | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Zena Mshana | Trustee | 13 June 2019 |
|
|
||||
Sybil Florenteina Roach-Tennant | Trustee | 21 April 2016 |
|
|
||||
LEROY WENHAM | Trustee | 18 December 2013 |
|
|
||||
EKWAEJU COLIN OHWOISI | Trustee | 17 January 2013 |
|
|
||||
DES REID | Trustee | 17 January 2013 |
|
|
||||
JULIUS ELIAS KENNEDY MBE | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £126.94k | £100.18k | £150.34k | £179.58k | £189.51k | |
|
Total expenditure | £114.07k | £101.74k | £132.44k | £150.34k | £162.05k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 08 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 08 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 14 May 2024 | 104 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 14 May 2024 | 104 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 21 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 21 December 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 10 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 10 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 15 March 2021 | 43 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 15 March 2021 | 43 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 27 OCTOBER 1995 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTIONS 16 NOVEMBER 1999, 10 MARCH 2005 AND 14 SEPTEMBER 2006
Charitable objects
1 TO RELIEVE POVERTY AND UNEMPLOYMENT AND TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION AND TRAINING OF INHABITANTS WHO ARE OF AFRICAN OR CARIBBEAN ORIGIN OR DESCENT IN THE CITY OF SHEFFIELD, BY SUCH MEANS AS THE DIRECTORS DEEM APPROPRIATE, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY: A PROVIDING OR ARRANGING FOR THE PROVISION OF CHILDCARE AND NURSERY FACILITIES B PROVIDING ADVICE AND SUPPORT TO BUSINESSES OR PERSONS CONTEMPLATING STARTING A BUSINESS C ACQUIRING, ESTABLISHING, MAINTAINING AND MANAGING A CENTRE TO BE KNOWN AS THE SOUTH YORKSHIRE AFRICAN CARIBBEAN BUSINESS AND ENTERPRISE TRAINING CENTRE ('THE CENTRE') AND SUCH OTHER FACILITY OR FACILITIES AS THE COMPANY MAY FROM TIME TO TIME REQUIRE FOR THE ACTIVITIES PROMOTED BY THE COMPANY D CO-OPERATING AND ENTERING INTO ARRANGEMENTS WITH ANY OTHER BODIES WHETHER NATIONAL, LOCAL, VOLUNTARY OR STATUTORY, COMMERCIAL, INDUSTRIAL OR OTHERWISE IN THE ACQUISITION, ESTABLISHMENT, MANAGEMENT OR MAINTENANCE OF THE CENTRE. 2 TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN AFRICAN-CARIBBEAN ART AND AFRICAN-CARIBBEAN CULTURE AND IN THE CONTRIBUTION THAT ETHNIC MINORITIES HAVE MADE TO THE SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC LIFE OF THE CITY AND ITS SURROUNDING AREA. 3 TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN AFRICAN-CARIBBEAN ART AND AFRICAN-CARIBBEAN CULTURE AND IN THE CONTRIBUTION THAT ETHNIC MINORITIES HAVE MADE TO THE SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC LIFE OF THE CITY AND ITS SURROUNDING AREA TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC BY THE FUNDING OR SPONSORSHIP OF BURSARIES, SCHOLARSHIPS OR GRANTS; AND TO SUPPORT SUCH OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES AS THE COMPANY SHALL IN ITS ABSOLUTE DISCRETION DETERMINE WITH PARTICULAR REFERENCE TO THE RELIEF OF POVERTY OR THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION, IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE LAW OF ENGLAND AND WALES
Area of benefit
CITY OF SHEFFIELD
Contact information
- Address:
-
110-120 WICKER
SHEFFIELD
SOUTH YORKSHIRE
S3 8JD
- Phone:
- 01142232100
- Email:
- enquiries@syacltd.org.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window