Financial history GRAFT THAMES VALLEY LTD

Charity number: 1119388
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £34.16k £61.10k £58.16k £43.24k £76.65k
Total expenditure £33.94k £42.14k £62.02k £48.97k £51.39k
Income from government contracts N/A £7.57k £4.50k £4.77k £14.58k
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A £9.81k N/A