Financial history PURITON HORSE RESCUE

Charity number: 1114875
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 29/03/2015 29/03/2016 29/03/2017 29/03/2018 29/03/2019
Total gross income £6.23k £7.89k £8.12k £9.25k £6.78k
Total expenditure £5.89k £7.43k £7.50k £8.65k £5.95k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A