PURITON HORSE RESCUE
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
OPEN DAYS, BOOTSALES, AUCTIONS, FARM SALES, DOG SHOWS.VW WEEKENDS, CLUBS FOR DISABLE CHILDREN AND ALDULTS
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 29 March 2019
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Animals
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Bath And North East Somerset
- Blackpool
- Bristol City
- Cornwall
- Devon
- Dudley
- East Sussex
- Leeds City
- Leicestershire
- Throughout London
Governance
- 26 June 2006: Standard registration
- 09 March 2020: Removed (Ceased to exist)
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 29/03/2015 | 29/03/2016 | 29/03/2017 | 29/03/2018 | 29/03/2019 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £6.23k | £7.89k | £8.12k | £9.25k | £6.78k | |
|
Total expenditure | £5.89k | £7.43k | £7.50k | £8.65k | £5.95k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 29 March 2019 | 16 December 2019 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 29 March 2019 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 29 March 2018 | 07 July 2019 | 159 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 29 March 2018 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 29 March 2017 | 29 January 2018 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 29 March 2017 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 29 March 2016 | 29 March 2017 | 59 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 29 March 2016 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 6 MAY 2006
Charitable objects
FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC TO RELIEVE THE SUFFERING OF HORSES AND OTHER ANIMALS IN NEED OF CARE AND ATTENTION AND, IN PARTICULAR , TO PROVIDE AND MAINTAIN RESCUE HOMES OR OTHER FACILITIES FOR THE RECEPTION, CARE AND TREATMENT OF SUCH ANIMALS. TO PROMOTE HUMANE BEHAVIOUR TOWARDS ANIMALS BY PROVIDING APPROPRIATE CARE, TRAINING, PROTECTION, TREATMENT AND SECURITY FOR ANIMALS WHICH ARE IN NEED OF CARE AND ATTENTION BY REASON OF SICKNESS, MALTREATMENT, POOR CIRCUMSTANCES OR ILL USAGE, AND TO EDUCATE THE PUBLIC IN MATTERS PERTAINING TO ANIMAL WELFARE IN GENERAL AND THE PREVENTION OF CRUELTY AND SUFFERING AMONG ANIMALS.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window