JESUS IS LORD MINISTRIES

Charity number: 1115024
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Jesus is Lord Ministry aims to preach the good news of our Lord Jesus Christ in the whole world. The ministry also aims to help those who are in need to be helped. The main goal for the ministry is to help people to know 'why Jesus Christ came on this planet earth'. Then for them to decide if they want to accept Jesus Christ as their saviour by peace not by force because He came for peace.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 01 January 2024

Total income: £0
Total expenditure: £0

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
  • Religious Activities
Who the charity helps:
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Human Resources
Where the charity operates:
  • City Of London
  • Haringey

Governance

Registration history:
  • 30 June 2006: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

4 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Desire Mbabaali Trustee 13 December 2024
None on record
SAMUEL OHENE-APRAKU Trustee
None on record
MR J KABUNGA Trustee
None on record
ABDNUL HAKIIMU SEMAKULA Trustee
None on record

Financial history

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 01/01/2017 01/01/2021 01/01/2022 01/01/2023 01/01/2024
Total gross income £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Total expenditure £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 01 January 2024 07 March 2025 126 days late
Accounts and TAR 01 January 2024 Not Required
Annual return 01 January 2023 07 March 2025 492 days late
Accounts and TAR 01 January 2023 Not Required
Annual return 01 January 2022 07 March 2025 857 days late
Accounts and TAR 01 January 2022 Not Required
Annual return 01 January 2021 07 March 2025 1222 days late
Accounts and TAR 01 January 2021 Not Required
Annual return 01 January 2020 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1669 days
Accounts and TAR 01 January 2020 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1669 days
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
22
George Lansbury House
Progress Way
LONDON
N22 5PD
Phone:
07470736642
Website:

No information available