Financial history THE SMILE TRAIN UK

Charity number: 1114748
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £7.91m £8.91m £10.34m £11.14m £12.31m
Total expenditure £7.31m £9.02m £11.30m £10.37m £11.76m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £7.88m £8.91m £10.33m £11.13m £12.28m
Income - Other trading activities £25.00k £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £662 £33 £3.02k £3.67k £33.02k
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £2.80m £1.90m £3.31m £2.74m £2.94m
Expenditure - Charitable activities £4.21m £5.66m £6.96m £4.61m £6.04m
Expenditure - Raising funds £3.10m £3.36m £4.34m £5.76m £5.71m
Expenditure - Governance £506.86k £463.65k £462.41k £509.11k £443.39k
Expenditure - Grants institution £3.70m £5.20m £6.50m £4.10m £5.60m
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0