Accounts and annual returns HATFIELD COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1114916
Charity reporting is overdue by 90 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 90 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 90 days
Annual return 31 March 2023 26 February 2025 392 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2022 25 June 2023 145 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2021 07 February 2023 372 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 20 April 2021 79 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required