CITY OF PEACE COMMUNITY CHURCH

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Activities include: - A Sunday morning meeting which includes,a Bible talk, singing, prayers and friendship - Weekly Bible studies - Service projects in the community - Youth group for secondary school children - Community outreach
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Religious Activities
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Tower Hamlets
Governance
- 28 June 2006: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Simon Peters | Chair | 13 December 2017 |
|
|
||||
Rev Brian Kenneth Stevens | Trustee | 04 October 2018 |
|
|
||||
Mr Robin McCartney | Trustee | 13 December 2017 |
|
|
||||
Mr Lewis Ilesanmi | Trustee | 13 December 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £47.86k | £35.96k | £43.07k | £44.48k | £49.36k | |
|
Total expenditure | £39.44k | £26.86k | £35.09k | £38.45k | £47.21k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 18 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 20 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 25 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 25 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 12 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 16 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 05 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 28 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 11 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 30 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 13 FEBRUARY 2006.
Charitable objects
(1) THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE CHRISTIAN RELIGION AS TAUGHT IN THE BOOKS OF THE OLD AND NEW TESTAMENTS AND AS DESCRIBED IN THE STATEMENT OF FAITH. (2) THE RELIEF OF POVERTY, SICKNESS AND DISTRESS OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE ISLE OF DOGS AND THE SURROUNDING AREAS.
Area of benefit
THE ISLE OF DOGS AND SURROUNDIGN AREAS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
6 BILLSON STREET
LONDON
E14 3DA
- Phone:
- 03003653787
- Email:
- cityofpeacecc@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window