HULL IVF TRUST LIMITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To relieve persons suffering from infertility by assisting in the running of an IVF Unit in Hull and to undertake research into the treatment and relief of infertility and to provide support for such research.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2023
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- People With Disabilities
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Kingston Upon Hull City
Governance
- 24 July 2006: Standard registration
- HULL IVF TRUST FUND (Previous name)
- HULL IVF TRUST FUND LIMITED (Previous name)
- Conflicting interests
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Daniel John Hammond | Trustee | 07 January 2014 |
|
|
||||
DR JANET SHERMAN | Trustee | 10 May 2013 |
|
|
||||
Dr SUSAN MARIE WEAVER | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2019 | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | 31/07/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £600 | £600 | £6.64k | £660 | £678 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2023 | 30 April 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2022 | 23 June 2023 | 23 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2022 | 04 May 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2021 | 30 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2021 | 19 May 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2020 | 22 June 2021 | 22 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2020 | 10 May 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2019 | 03 September 2020 | 95 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 28 MARCH 2006 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION 20 JULY 2006
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE PERSONS SUFFERING FROM INFERTILITY BY ASSISTING IN THE ESTABLISHMENT OF AN IVF (INVITRO FERTILISATION) UNIT AND THE RUNNING OF ANY IVF SERVICE AT ANY HOSPITAL OR OTHER SUITABLE LOCATION WITHIN THE CITY OF KINGSTON UPON HULL AND/OR THE COUNTY OF EAST YORKSHIRE AND TO UNDERTAKE AND/OR SUPPORT RESEARCH INTO THE CAUSES OF INFERTILITY AND INTO THE RELIEF OF INFERTILITY
Area of benefit
KINGSTON UPON HULL AND EAST YORKSHIRE
Contact information
- Address:
-
C/O D Hammond
ANDREW JACKSON SOLICITORS LLP
MARINA COURT
CASTLE STREET
HULL
HU1 1TJ
- Phone:
- 01482325242
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window