Accounts and annual returns MOTHERS AND DAUGHTERS SUPPORT GROUP UK

Charity number: 1116906
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 July 2014 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2014 Not submitted
Annual return 31 July 2013 26 February 2014 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2013 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2012 23 March 2013 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2012 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2011 14 February 2012 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2011 Not Required