Governing document MOTHERS AND DAUGHTERS SUPPORT GROUP UK
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEM AND ARTS OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 19 JULY 2002 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTIONS DATED 27 OCTOBER 2006, 19 JUNE 2009 AND 7 AUGUST 2009. AND CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 5 NOVEMBER 2007.
Charitable objects
(3) THE CHARITY'S OBJECTS ARE: (I) THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION AND THE PRESERVATION AND PROTECTION OF THE GOOD HEALTH OF WOMEN, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY MOTHERS AND DAUGHTERS IN LONDON, BY THE PROVISION OF ADVICE AND TRAINING. (II) THE RELIEF OF POVERTY AND SICKNESS IN ETHIOPIA.
Area of benefit
IN LONDON AND IN ETHIOPIA.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.