ALDERTON COMMUNITY TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To promote the sustainability of the diverse community that makes the village of Alderton and surrounding parish through the provision of facilites including recreational, social, environmental and educational. Projects to date include a village pavillion, community composting, apprentice allotments and affordable housing.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Accommodation/housing
- Amateur Sport
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Gloucestershire
Governance
- 15 August 2006: Standard registration
No other names
- Investment
- Risk management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MR ROLAND GUY STIRLING-LEE | Chair |
|
|
|||||||
Mark Adrian Hunt | Trustee | 02 May 2017 |
|
|||||||
JOHN FRANCIS APPLETON | Trustee | 01 April 2015 |
|
|
||||||
Robert John Smith-Graham | Trustee | 01 April 2015 |
|
|
||||||
KEITH HYLTON PAGE | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £9 | £2.76k | £456 | £1.07k | £13 | |
|
Total expenditure | £372 | £80 | £25 | £103 | £833 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 23 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 27 August 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 23 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 27 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 21 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 7 APRIL 2006 AS AMENDED BY WRITTEN RESOLUTION 17 JULY 2006
Charitable objects
(A) TO PROMOTE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF ALDERTON AND THE SURROUNDING AREA THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR RECREATION OR OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION OF INDIVIDUALS WHO HAVE NEED OF SUCH FACILITIES BY REASON OF THEIR YOUTH, AGE, INFIRMITY OR DISABLEMENT, FINANCIAL HARDSHIP OR SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC CIRCUMSTANCES OR FOR THE PUBLIC AT LARGE IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE AND WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITION OF LIFE OF THE SAID INHABITANTS. (B) THE PROVISION OF HOUSING IN ALDERTON AND THE SURROUNDING AREA FOR THOSE WHO ARE IN CONDITIONS OF NEED AND THE IMPROVEMENT OF HOUSING IN CHARITABLE OWNERSHIP PROVIDED THAT SUCH POWER SHALL NOT EXTEND TO RELIEVING ANY LOCAL AUTHORITIES OR OTHER BODIES OF A STATUTORY DUTY TO PROVIDE OR IMPROVE HOUSING. (C) TO SUPPORT ANY CHARITY OR CHARITABLE PURPOSE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF ALDERTON AND THE SURROUNDING AREA.
Area of benefit
ALDERTON AND THE SURROUNDING AREA
Contact information
- Address:
-
8 Willow Bank Road
Alderton
TEWKESBURY
GL20 8NJ
- Phone:
- 01242620539
- Email:
- mark@mahunt.plus.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window