REPRIEVE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We are an international legal action charity that uses strategic interventions to end the use of the death penalty globally, and to end extreme human rights abuses carried out by states in the context of the so-called "war on terror".
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
Total income:
£3,581,757
Donations and legacies | £1.79m | |
Charitable activities | £1.77m | |
Other trading activities | £0 | |
Investments | £23.98k | |
Other | £0 |
Total expenditure:
£3,536,042
Raising funds | £369.41k | |
Charitable activities | £3.17m | |
Other | £0 |
£0 investments gains (losses)
Total income includes £61,519 from 2 government grant(s)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £369.41k | |
Charitable expenditure | £3.17m | |
Retained for future use | £45.72k |
People

42 Employee(s)
12 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
Number of employees | |
---|---|
£60k to £70k | 2 |
£70k to £80k | 2 |
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Egypt
- India
- Indonesia
- Kenya
- Malawi
- Malaysia
- Pakistan
- Tanzania
- United States
- Yemen
Governance
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Nawaz Mohammed Hanif | Trustee | 16 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Helen Marshall | Trustee | 20 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Rupert Welchman | Trustee | 17 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Harisimran Arora-Lalani | Trustee | 10 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Matthew McGregor | Trustee | 06 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Christopher Duckett | Trustee | 06 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Luca Bosatta | Trustee | 13 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Lady Elish Angiolini | Trustee | 26 April 2021 |
|
|||||
Jane Elaine Tenenbaum | Trustee | 18 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Stephen Kinsella | Trustee | 23 October 2019 |
|
|||||
ALEXANDRA PRINGLE | Trustee | 17 July 2019 |
|
|
||||
AYESHA HAZARIKA | Trustee | 17 July 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £2.85m | £3.31m | £3.58m | £3.60m | £3.58m | |
|
Total expenditure | £2.94m | £3.31m | £3.48m | £3.72m | £3.54m | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £180.74k | £120.27k | £148.73k | £131.99k | £61.52k | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £1.57m | £1.51m | £1.70m | £1.59m | £1.79m | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £2.36k | £3.22k | £3.07k | £220 | £0 | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £1.27m | £1.77m | £1.80m | £2.00m | £1.77m | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | £7.69k | £5.81k | £3.55k | £8.31k | £23.98k | |
|
Income - Other | £0 | £23.47k | £72.00k | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Legacies | £8.33k | £38.18k | £55.00k | £62.24k | £156.58k | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £2.55m | £2.96m | £3.10m | £3.33m | £3.17m | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £385.80k | £352.61k | £375.33k | £387.40k | £369.41k | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £34.57k | £38.20k | £42.36k | £42.37k | £46.20k | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £38.12k | £26.87k | £46.06k | £24.01k | £7.97k | |
|
Long-term investments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Other assets | £2.62m | £2.51m | £2.20m | £1.84m | £1.86m | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | £1.13m | £1.08m | £672.64k | £409.12k | £374.67k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 25 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 25 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 14 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 14 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 19 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 19 May 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 21 May 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 21 May 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 05 May 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 05 May 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 11 APR 2006 NOW ARTICLES ADOPTED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 15 DEC 2011 as amended on 31 Jan 2024
Charitable objects
1. TO PROMOTE HUMAN RIGHTS (AS SET OUT IN THE UNIVERSAL DECLARATION OF HUMAN RIGHTS AND SUBSEQUENT UNITED NATIONS CONVENTIONS AND DECLARATIONS) THROUGHOUT THE WORLD WITH A FOCUS ON THE USE OF THE DEATH PENALTY IN CONTRAVENTION OF ARTICLE 3, THE RIGHT TO LIFE, LIBERTY AND SECURITY OF PERSON, AND ARTICLES 5-11, THE RELATED RIGHTS TO EQUAL TREATMENT, A FAIR TRIAL AND FREEDOM FROM TORTURE OR CRUEL, INHUMAN DEGRADING TREATMENT OR PUNISHMENT. THIS OBJECT WILL BE ACHIEVED THROUGH CASEWORK, ADVOCACY AND OUTREACH, BY ALL OR ANY OF THE FOLLOWING MEANS: 1.1 OBTAINING REDRESS FOR THE VICTIMS OF HUMAN RIGHTS ABUSE, INCLUDING PROVIDING LEGAL ADVICE, LEGAL REPRESENTATION, CASE INVESTIGATION AND OTHER ASSISTANCE TO INDIVIDUALS FACING THE DEATH PENALTY AND OTHER RELATED ABUSES OF HUMAN RIGHTS; 1.2 RELIEVING NEED AMONG THE VICTIMS OF HUMAN RIGHTS ABUSE SUCH AS THE DEATH PENALTY, THROUGH LEGAL ADVICE, REPRESENTATION, INVESTIGATION AND OTHER ASSISTANCE, INCLUDING WITH REGARD TO INHUMANE CONDITIONS IN PRISON OR ON DEATH ROW; 1.3 MONITORING ABUSES OF HUMAN RIGHTS INCLUDING IMPOSITION OF THE DEATH PENALTY; 1.4 EDUCATING THE PUBLIC ABOUT HUMAN RIGHTS AND THE DEATH PENALTY; 1.5 EDUCATING AND TRAINING LEGAL AND OTHER PROFESSIONALS WHO PROVIDE ASSISTANCE TO PEOPLE FACING THE DEATH PENALTY AND OTHER ABUSES OF HUMAN RIGHTS; 1.6 PROVIDING TECHNICAL ADVICE TO GOVERNMENT AND OTHERS ON HUMAN RIGHTS MATTERS, ESPECIALLY THOSE PERTAINING TO THE USE OF THE DEATH PENALTY; 1.7 CONTRIBUTING TO THE SOUND ADMINISTRATION OF HUMAN RIGHTS LAW, WITH A FOCUS ON THE DEATH PENALTY; 1.8 COMMENTING ON PROPOSED HUMAN RIGHTS LEGISLATION AS IT RELATES TO THE DEATH PENALTY AND OTHER RELATED ISSUES; 1.9 RAISING AWARENESS OF HUMAN RIGHTS ISSUES, ESPECIALLY THOSE RELATING TO THE DEATH PENALTY; 1.10 RESEARCH INTO HUMAN RIGHTS ISSUES SURROUNDING USE OF THE DEATH PENALTY AND OTHER ABUSES OF HUMAN RIGHTS; 1.11 PROMOTING PUBLIC SUPPORT FOR HUMAN RIGHTS RELATED TO THE DEATH PENALTY; 1.12 PROMOTING RESPECT FOR HUMAN RIGHTS RELATED TO THE DEATH PENALTY AMONG INDIVIDUALS AND CORPORATIONS; 1.13 INTERNATIONAL ADVOCACY OF HUMAN RIGHTS RELATING TO THE DEATH PENALTY; 1.14 ELIMINATING INFRINGEMENTS OF HUMAN RIGHTS RELATING TO THE DEATH PENALTY. 2. TO RELIEVE THE POVERTY, SUFFERING AND DISTRESS OF PERSONS AND THE FAMILIES OF PERSONS FACING THE DEATH PENALTY AND OTHER RELATED HUMAN RIGHTS VIOLATIONS THROUGHOUT THE WORLD, WHO FOR REASONS FO THEIR POVERTY ARE IN NEED OF LEGAL REPRESENTATION OR OTHER ASSISTANCE
Area of benefit
WORLDWIDE
Contact information
- Address:
-
PO BOX 78292
London
E1W 9SS
- Phone:
- 02075538140
- Email:
- info@reprieve.org.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window