JUSTICE FIRST LIMITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The activities of the charity are to provide food and support including the provision of guidance , advice and assistance on health, employment and welfare matters to asylum seekers in the Tees Valley
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 April 2024
Total income includes £18,500 from 3 government grant(s)
People

8 Trustee(s)
8 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Accommodation/housing
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Darlington
- Hartlepool
- Middlesbrough
- Redcar And Cleveland
- Stockton-on-tees
Governance
- 16 October 2006: Standard registration
- JUSTICE FIRST LTD (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
BARBARA HELEN HUNGIN | Chair |
|
||||||
Ian Mawson | Trustee | 30 July 2024 |
|
|||||
Susan Ravalde | Trustee | 30 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Hamida White | Trustee | 11 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Stephen Ollis | Trustee | 23 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
FREDERICK JOHN HUTCHINSON | Trustee | 31 May 2017 |
|
|
||||
Tresor Nyembwe BUKASA | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
CATHERINE RAMOS | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/04/2020 | 30/04/2021 | 30/04/2022 | 30/04/2023 | 30/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £166.70k | £175.26k | £153.49k | £189.67k | £170.31k | |
|
Total expenditure | £151.43k | £133.78k | £142.10k | £164.77k | £161.62k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £21.50k | £15.00k | £10.00k | £12.00k | £18.50k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 April 2024 | 12 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2024 | 12 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2023 | 04 February 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2023 | 04 February 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2022 | 27 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2022 | 27 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2021 | 15 March 2022 | 15 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2021 | 15 March 2022 | 15 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2020 | 11 February 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2020 | 11 February 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 30 MARCH 2006 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 18 SEPTEMBER 2006 as amended on 12 Sept 2024
Charitable objects
To relieve poverty, sickness and distress among asylum seekers in the North East of England (primarily the Tees Valley, County Durham and the wider Tyne Valley), particularly but not exclusively, by the provision of guidance, advice and assistance on asylum, health, employment, welfare and education.
Area of benefit
THE TEES VALLEY
Contact information
- Address:
-
133 Norton Road
STOCKTON-ON-TEES
TS18 2BG
- Phone:
- 01642601122
- Email:
- info@justicefirst.org.uk
- Website:
-
WWW.JUSTICEFIRST.ORG.UK
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window