Financial history ACTION FOR REFUGEES IN LEWISHAM

Charity number: 1116344
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/05/2020 31/05/2021 31/05/2022 31/05/2023 31/05/2024
Total gross income £222.90k £196.92k £239.75k £304.99k £483.12k
Total expenditure £166.24k £198.03k £231.99k £283.96k £524.21k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A £84.16k
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A £2.48k £74.48k