Financial history THE NARROW GATE PROJECT

Charity Number: 1115530
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £20.83k £18.49k £46.45k £70.76k £77.54k
Total expenditure £15.03k £13.15k £40.25k £68.90k £80.21k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A