ST ANDREWS SCHOOL TURI EDUCATIONAL TRUST (UK)
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Trustees are engaged in setting up procedures for the raising and disbursement of funds in aid of St Andrew's School, Turi, Kenya. The chairman and other trustees have met some of the school Governors at the School during the year and have been briefed by the Heasmasters.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2021
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout England And Wales
- Kenya
Governance
- 01 September 2006: Standard registration
- 01 March 2022: Removed (Ceased to exist)
- ST ANDREWS SCHOOL TURI EDUCATIONAL TRUST UK (Previous name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2017 | 05/04/2018 | 05/04/2019 | 05/04/2020 | 05/04/2021 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £36 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £8.60k | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2021 | 01 February 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2020 | 24 March 2021 | 47 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2019 | 24 March 2021 | 413 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2019 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2018 | 27 April 2019 | 81 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2018 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 10 APRIL 2005.
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUPILS AT THE EVANGELICAL CHRISTIAN SCHOOL, ST ANDREWS SCHOOL TURI, KENYA BY PROVIDING AND ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR EDUCATION AT THE SCHOOL.
Area of benefit
AT THE EVANGELICAL CHRISTIAN SCHOOL, ST ANREWS SCHOOL, TURI, KENYA.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window