COMMUNITY HERITAGE ARTS AND MEDIA PROJECT LIMITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Trust manages three heritage community buildings within Barton: the Hub, Assembly Rooms and 51 Fleetgate.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
7 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Other Charitable Activities
- North East Lincolnshire
- North Lincolnshire
Governance
- 29 June 2006: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
NEIL CHARLES TURNER | Chair |
|
||||||
Tim Needham | Trustee | 27 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
David Aaron Watson | Trustee | 31 October 2019 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £92.45k | £90.69k | £50.79k | £53.84k | £62.57k | |
|
Total expenditure | £81.19k | £57.53k | £85.17k | £79.13k | £78.70k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £30.13k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £12.00k | £43.78k | £22.10k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 14 April 2025 | 73 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 117 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 28 August 2024 | 210 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 28 August 2024 | 210 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 31 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 31 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 18 March 2022 | 46 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 18 March 2022 | 46 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 16 August 2021 | 197 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 16 August 2021 | 197 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 16 MAY 2006 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 23 SEP 2016
Charitable objects
THE CHARITY’S OBJECTS ARE TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE RESIDENTS OF THE NORTH LINCOLNSHIRE REGION BY ENCOURAGING KNOWLEDGE OF LOCAL HERITAGE, PRIMARILY BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY THROUGH THE ESTABLISHMENT AND MAINTENANCE OF A MUSEUM AND THROUGH THE USE OF ARTS AND MEDIA ACTIVITIES INCLUDING MUSIC, DANCE, VISUAL ARTS, PHOTOGRAPHY, VIDEO, DRAMA AND ELECTRONIC MEDIA FORMS
Area of benefit
NORTH LINCOLNSHIRE
Contact information
- Address:
-
Hub (previously the Youth Centre)
Maltby Lane
BARTON-UPON-HUMBER
DN18 5PY
- Phone:
- 07884933788
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window