Financial history RAUCEBY C OF E SCHOOL PTFA

Charity number: 1114927
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2020 31/07/2021 31/07/2022 31/07/2023 31/07/2024
Total gross income £4.62k £2.07k £13.15k £5.63k £9.65k
Total expenditure £1.45k £3.16k £11.84k £4.15k £7.42k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A