EMAAN FOUNDATION (TEESSIDE) UK

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To provide immediate and essential aid in conjunction with local based charities in Pakistan. To raise and provide funds towards building a village and medical in the area of Rahim Yar Khan and other areas in Pakistan if required.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Accommodation/housing
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Middlesbrough
- Pakistan
Governance
- 29 June 2006: Standard registration
- EMAAN FOUNDATION (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Sohail Khan | Chair | 01 February 2019 |
|
|
||||
Naila Naz Khan | Trustee | 01 July 2020 |
|
|
||||
IMRAN MAQBOOL | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
SAIRAH KHAN | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2020 | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | 30/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £4.47k | £26.97k | £29.90k | £14.23k | £13.56k | |
|
Total expenditure | £69.70k | £14.42k | £43.16k | £12.22k | £10.22k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | 29 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | 26 August 2024 | 118 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 08 June 2023 | 39 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | 08 June 2023 | 39 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 03 September 2022 | 126 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | 03 September 2022 | 126 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | 18 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 2 MAY 2006
Charitable objects
TO RAISE AND PROVIDE FUNDS TOWARDS THE RUNNING OF AN ORPHANAGE/SCHOOL IN THE MUZAFFRABAD DISTRICT OF PAKISTAN.
Area of benefit
PAKISTAN
Contact information
- Address:
-
Mian & Co Limited
7(A) OXFORD ROAD
LINTHORPE
MIDDLESBROUGH
TS5 5DY
- Phone:
- 01642860488
- Email:
- No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window