Accounts and annual returns INTERNATIONAL AID FOR KOREAN ANIMALS UK

Charity Number: 1115187
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2016 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 Not submitted
Annual return 31 December 2015 27 June 2016 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2015 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2014 02 June 2015 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2014 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2013 17 July 2014 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2013 Not Required