Financial history THE CENTRE FOR EQUALITY AND DIVERSITY

Charity Number: 1114821
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £93.93k £77.56k £93.89k £150.51k £42.41k
Total expenditure £90.24k £67.13k £94.87k £116.00k £55.44k
Income from government contracts £93.91k £57.85k £93.89k £94.35k N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A