Financial history FRIENDS OF MONMOUTH COMPREHENSIVE SCHOOL BOAT CLUB

Charity number: 1120581
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £30.60k £11.64k £716 £13.24k £9.80k
Total expenditure £3.40k £7.49k £1.89k £8.92k £4.25k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A