Trustees FRIENDS OF MONMOUTH COMPREHENSIVE SCHOOL BOAT CLUB
Charity number: 1120581

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Eric Crane | Trustee | 20 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Colette Pardington | Trustee | 18 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Kate Stafford | Trustee | 27 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Kirsty Hennessey | Trustee | 27 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Allard Van der horst | Trustee | 01 August 2020 |
|
|
||||
Elizabeth Watkins | Trustee | 01 February 2020 |
|
|
||||
Sally Chilton | Trustee | 25 January 2020 |
|
|
||||
Clare Knapman | Trustee | 13 June 2016 |
|
|
||||
ZOE CROSSLEY | Trustee | 29 January 2012 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.