THE WEIR LINK

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Weir Link has transformed what was the derelict Weir Hall on the Weir Estate in Thornton Ward South London into a community centre and benefit for the whole community. Facilities provided include a Community Reception and Information area, an Adult Education Training Room, a Nursery providing full day-care and a drop-in creche, 2 offices, a meeting room and a kitchen.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

9 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Lambeth
- Wandsworth
Governance
- 26 June 2006: Standard registration
No other names
- Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MIKE HAYES | Chair | 22 February 2012 |
|
|
||||
COMFORT AKINMURELE | Trustee | 11 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Laura Hale | Trustee | 22 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Laura Kathryn Boyd | Trustee | 16 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
James Alexander Boyd | Trustee | 16 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Rachel Daphne Stokes | Trustee | 25 February 2020 |
|
|
||||
Carlo Taczalski | Trustee | 01 August 2017 |
|
|
||||
Margaret Hedley | Trustee | 22 October 2013 |
|
|
||||
RICHARD MARTIN JOHN LEA | Trustee | 22 February 2012 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £63.05k | £59.96k | £66.78k | £74.22k | £92.65k | |
|
Total expenditure | £79.01k | £86.61k | £91.43k | £99.08k | £107.66k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 09 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 09 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 03 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 03 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 19 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 19 December 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 15 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 15 December 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 07 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 07 December 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 17 MAY 2006 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 1 OCTOBER 2008
Charitable objects
THE PROMOTION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT OF URBAN OR RURAL REGENERATION IN AREAS OF SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC DEPRIVATION (AND IN PARTICULAR THE AREA OF BENEFIT) BY ALL OF OR ANY OF THE FOLLOWING MEANS: - SEE GOVERNING DOCUMENT FOR DETAILS.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED. IN PRACTICE, GREATER LONDON.
Contact information
- Address:
-
The Weir Link
33 Weir Road
London
SW12 0NU
- Phone:
- 02086735153
- Email:
- hello@theweirlink.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window