RIDEAWAY TRUST
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Since the charity started we bought 94 electric wheelchairs, 52 manual wheelchairs and about 42 4 wheel walkers in abourt 4 yrs. Done 20-30 repairs, supply radar, keys free to our customers and other people if needed. If this will help we wish to thank you. The rideaway trust and all the trustees.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2014
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Disability
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Throughout England
Governance
- 20 July 2006: Standard registration
- 09 June 2017: Removed (Does not operate)
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2010 | 31/12/2011 | 31/12/2012 | 31/12/2013 | 31/12/2014 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £4.81k | £3.74k | £3.36k | £4.65k | £2.85k | |
|
Total expenditure | £3.31k | £2.64k | £1.89k | £3.31k | £2.06k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2016 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2016 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2015 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2015 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2014 | 02 February 2015 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2014 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2013 | 11 April 2014 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2013 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 26 JUNE 2006
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE DISABLED PERSONS BY PROVIDING WHEELCHAIRS AND WALKING AIDS WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THEIR MOBILITY AND CONDITIONS OF LIFE.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED. IN PRACTICE YORKSHIRE
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window