CRESSING PRIMARY SCHOOL
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Primary School
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2019
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Essex
Governance
- 29 June 2006: Standard registration
- 06 January 2021: Removed (Ceased to exist)
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2015 | 31/08/2016 | 31/08/2017 | 31/08/2018 | 31/08/2019 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £17.02k | £15.79k | £15.61k | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £17.90k | £14.30k | £14.36k | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 11 December 2020 | 164 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2018 | 11 December 2020 | 530 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2018 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2017 | 23 June 2018 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2017 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 26 JANUARY 2006
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUPILS OF CRESSING PRIMARY SCHOOL (HEREINAFTER CALLED 'THE SCHOOL') BY PROVIDING OR ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION OF EDUCATIONAL, RECREATIONAL AND OTHER CHARITABLE FACILITIES IN AUGMENTATION OF SUCH FACILITIES FINANCED BY THE LOCAL AUTHORITY OR THE DEPARTMENT FOR EDUCATION AND EMPLOYMENT (DFEE). IN FURTHERANCE OF THIS OBJECT BUT NOT FURTHER OR OTHERWISE THE TRUSTEES MAY UNDERTAKE ACTIVITIES WHICH PROMOTE THE CHARITABLE WORK OF THE SCHOOL AND FURTHER THE EDUCATION AND ADVANCEMENT IN LIFE OF THE PUPILS.
Area of benefit
CRESSING
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window