STONE (STAFFS) AND DISTRICT UNIVERSITY OF THE THIRD AGE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To advance the education of people over 18 who are not in full time employment. The provision of facilities for leisure time and recreational activities e.g. Photography, Computer Studies, Dancing, Languages, Walking, Tai Chi, Bowling, Arts& Crafts and Social Events, with the objective of improving the condition of life for the above persons in the interest of their social welfare.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 October 2023
Total income includes £600 from 1 government grant(s)
People

6 Trustee(s)
70 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Recreation
- Elderly/old People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Staffordshire
Governance
- 28 June 2006: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Lesley Deaville | Trustee | 05 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Susan Roche | Trustee | 05 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Chris Norcross | Trustee | 30 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Linda Thompson | Trustee | 30 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Brian Johnson | Trustee | 30 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Frank Harrison | Trustee | 28 November 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/10/2019 | 31/10/2020 | 31/10/2021 | 31/10/2022 | 31/10/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £36.12k | £2.04k | £20.03k | £28.75k | £28.89k | |
|
Total expenditure | £36.61k | £25.29k | £8.38k | £30.60k | £29.82k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £600 |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 October 2023 | 09 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2023 | 09 July 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2022 | 31 August 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2022 | 23 January 2024 | 145 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2021 | 30 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 October 2020 | 10 September 2021 | 10 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 October 2019 | 08 October 2020 | 38 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2019 | 08 October 2020 | 38 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 31/03/2006 AS AMENDED ON 04/02/2011
Charitable objects
(1) TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC AND IN PARTICULAR THE EDUCATION OF OLDER PEOPLE NO LONGER IN FULL TIME GAINFUL EMPLOYMENT IN STONE AND DISTRICT AND ITS SURROUNDING LOCALITY; (2) THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR LEISURE TIME AND RECREATIONAL ACTIVITIES WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE ABOVE PERSONS IN THE INTERESTS OF THEIR SOCIAL WELFARE.
Area of benefit
STONE, STAFFORDSHIRE AND ITS ENVIRONS
Contact information
- Address:
-
1 Meadowside
STONE
Staffordshire
ST15 8WA
- Phone:
- 07792273615
- Email:
- bhklv88@yahoo.com
- Website:
-
stone.u3asite.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window