EYE BACH CHOIR

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
to advance, improve, develop, and maintain public education in, and appreciation of music, particularly choral music, in all its aspects by the presentation of public choral and orchestral recitals and concerts
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
People

6 Trustee(s)
8 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Norfolk
- Suffolk
Governance
- 28 June 2006: Standard registration
- EBC (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
FELICITY ANNE GOLDING | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Nicola Wheeler | Trustee | 11 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Jane Bramhall | Trustee | 11 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Ann Elizabeth Hornung | Trustee | 22 June 2017 |
|
|
||||
Michael John Morley | Trustee | 22 June 2017 |
|
|
||||
Christine Hooker | Trustee | 22 June 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £17.83k | £13.83k | £5.94k | £24.06k | £16.07k | |
|
Total expenditure | £17.59k | £10.77k | £6.00k | £16.81k | £16.70k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 06 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 12 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 21 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 17 March 2022 | 260 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 06 January 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 23 SEPTEMBER 2005
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE, IMPROVE, DEVELOP AND MAINTAIN PUBLIC EDUCATION IN AND APPRECIATION OF THE ART AND SCIENCE OF MUSIC, PARTICULARLY CHORAL MUSIC, IN ALL ITS ASPECTS BY THE PRESENTATION OF PUBLIC CHORAL AND ORCHESTRAL RECITALS AND CONCERTS; AND FOR THE GENERAL PURPOSES OF SUCH CHARITABLE BODIES OR FOR SUCH OTHER PURPOSES AS SHELL BE EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE AS THE COMMITTEE MAY FROM TIME TO TIME DECIDE.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED. IN PRACTICE SUFFOLK AND SOUTH NORFOLK
Contact information
- Address:
-
The Cottage
Mellis Road
Thrandeston
DISS
Norfolk
IP21 4BU
- Phone:
- 07906 250906
- Email:
- eyebachchoir1974@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window