Accounts and annual returns THE CONFUCIUS TRUST

Charity number: 1114837
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 05 April 2024 22 April 2025 76 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2024 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2023 22 April 2025 442 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2023 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2022 11 December 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2022 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2021 11 December 2022 309 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2021 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2020 12 March 2021 35 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2020 Not Required