YELENI THERAPY & SUPPORT LTD

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We aim to provide a programme of free complementary therapies plus ongoing support via workshops, self help groups and exercise classes for anyone with cancer in Herefordshire and surrounding counties to help them cope with the rigours of conventional treatment and support them on their journey towards living well with, and beyond cancer. We also offer support to their carers.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 May 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
13 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Herefordshire
Governance
- 26 April 2007: Standard registration
- YELENI THERAPY & SUPPORT (Working name)
- THE YELENI SUPPORT CENTRE FOR CANCER & CHRONIC ILLNESS (Previous name)
- THE YELENI SUPPORT CENTRE FOR CANCER AND CHRONIC ILLNESS (Previous name)
- YELENI THERAPY & SUPPORT (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
SHEILA MARY ENID HIGGINS | Chair |
|
|
|||||
John Edwin Taylor | Trustee | 21 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Simon Richard Adcock | Trustee | 17 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Joanna Phyllis Hilditch DL | Trustee | 04 October 2022 |
|
|||||
Leanne Sharon Pogson | Trustee | 16 December 2020 |
|
|
||||
Julie Elizabeth Cohn | Trustee | 01 December 2014 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/05/2020 | 31/05/2021 | 31/05/2022 | 31/05/2023 | 31/05/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £119.39k | £193.93k | £161.92k | £118.13k | £124.58k | |
|
Total expenditure | £121.24k | £128.31k | £150.62k | £129.48k | £131.91k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £16.66k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 May 2024 | 20 March 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2024 | 20 March 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2023 | 30 March 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2023 | 30 March 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2022 | 28 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2022 | 28 November 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2021 | 19 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2021 | 26 August 2022 | 148 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2020 | 22 February 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR |
31 May 2020
(These accounts |
22 February 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 17 MAY 2006 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 27 MAR 2007 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 22 APR 2016 NULL AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 15 OCT 2019 as amended on 02 Feb 2021
Charitable objects
The charity's objects ("the objects") are to help relieve sickness and preserve and protect the good health, primarily but not exclusively, of people with cancer and their carers by providing or assisting in the provision of: (a) complementary therapies including, but not exclusively; acupuncture, herbal medicine, homeopathy, aromatherapy, bach and other flower remedies, body work therapies, counselling, stress therapy, hypnotherapy, meditation, reflexology, shiatsu, healing, nutritional medicine, yoga and reiki. (b) information, education, advice, support and counselling.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED.
Contact information
- Address:
-
2 BLACKFRIARS STREET
HEREFORD
HEREFORDSHIRE
HR4 9HS
- Phone:
- 01432 342 342
- Email:
- info@yelenisupport.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window