THE CAMPAIGN FOR DRAWING

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The charity delivers programmes to encourage and develop the use of drawing both by the general public and by professionals. The annual Big Draw is a month-long season of drawing events in October across the UK. The Power Drawing: Professional Development Programme shares with educators what the charity has learnt about the purposes and uses of drawing as an aid to learning.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout London
Governance
- 23 June 2006: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ERIC GEORGE REYNOLDS | Chair | 03 July 2024 |
|
|||||||||||||||
Daniel McAuliffe | Trustee | 01 October 2024 |
|
|
||||||||||||||
Mark Chester | Trustee | 16 July 2024 |
|
|
||||||||||||||
Graham Southern | Trustee | 03 July 2024 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £128.66k | £137.20k | £93.06k | £131.03k | £165.07k | |
|
Total expenditure | £134.72k | £96.98k | £113.42k | £124.82k | £191.59k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £10.00k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 12 February 2025 | 12 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 12 February 2025 | 12 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 29 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 29 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 30 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 30 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 18 March 2022 | 46 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 18 March 2022 | 46 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 31 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 31 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 30 MARCH 2006 as amended on 14 Feb 2011
Charitable objects
1 TO PROMOTE DRAWING BY PEOPLE OF ALL AGES IN ALL SECTIONS OF SOCIETY IN THE UNITED KINGDOM AND OVERSEAS, WITH THE AIM OF ENGAGING THEM IN CREATIVE ACTIVITIES, AS A MEDIUM FOR LEARNING, TO FACILITATE INTELLECTUAL AND EMOTIONAL DEVELOPMENT, TO ENCOURAGE GREATER CULTURAL APPRECIATION AND TO HEIGHTEN AWARENESS, PARTICULARLY THROUGH DRAWING, IN A RANGE OF SETTINGS SUCH AS COLLEGES, SCHOOLS, MUSEUMS, GALLERIES, HERITAGE SITES, LIBRARIES, COMMUNITY CENTRES AND OTHER PUBLIC BUILDINGS, PARKS, OPEN SPACES AND THE COUNTRYSIDE; AND 2 THE PROMOTION OF SUCH OTHER PURPOSES BEING EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE ACCORDING TO THE LAW OF ENGLAND AND WALES AS THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME DETERMINE.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED. IN PRACTICE, NATIONAL AND OVERSEAS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
The Big Draw HQ
C/o Urban Space Management
Trinity Buoy Wharf
64 Orchard Place
London
E14 0JW
- Phone:
- 02075384198
- Email:
- info@thebigdraw.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window