RIPPLES FOUNDATION UK
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
RIPPLES FOUNDATION UK WORKS WITH BME WOMEN SUFFERING OR AT RISK OF DOMESTIC ABUSE; HELPING THEM BACK INTO WORK.WE WORK WITH PARTNERS TO PROMOTE RACIAL COHESION AND CELEBRATE DIVERSITY. WORK WITH WOMEN IN AFRICAN VILLAGES, SETTING UP SUSTAINABLE VILLAGE ENTERPRISES, PROVIDING INFORMATION AND OFFERING MEDICAL SUPPORT
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2017
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Economic/community Development/employment
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Kent
- Throughout London
- Ghana
- Nigeria
Governance
- 08 November 2006: Standard registration
- 19 May 2021: Removed (Ceased to exist)
- BME CONCERN (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2013 | 30/09/2014 | 30/09/2015 | 30/09/2016 | 30/09/2017 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £151.51k | £211.30k | £286.78k | £191.70k | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £135.37k | £208.88k | £296.87k | £241.74k | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2019 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2019 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2018 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2018 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2017 | 30 July 2018 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2017 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 15/07/2005 AS AMENDED ON 13/08/2006 AS AMENDED ON 02/05/2015
Charitable objects
I) TO PRIMARILY, BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY ASSIST IN THE RELIEF OF WOMEN AND THEIR CHILDREN FROM MINORITY ETHNIC GROUPS WHO HAVE OR ARE SUFFERING OR WHO ARE AT RISK OF SUFFERING DOMESTIC ABUSE. II) TO PROMOTE GOOD RELATIONS BETWEEN PERSONS OF DIFFERENT RACIAL GROUPS BY ENDEAVOURING TO RAISE LEVELS OF TOLERANCE THROUGH EDUCATION, ART AND CULTURE. III) TO RELIEVE POVERTY AMONG WOMEN AND CHILDREN IN AFRICA IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY, BY THE PROVISION OD SUPPORT, EDUCATION AND BY SUCH OTHER CHARITABLE MEANS AS THE EXECUTIVE COMMITTEE THINK FIT.
Area of benefit
AFRICA
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window