ONE PERCENT SCHEME

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
ONE PERCENT SCHEME IS A CHARITY WHICH POOLS MEMBERS DONATIONS AND SHARES THIS MONEY BETWEEN 4 SMALL CHARITIES. THESE ARE CHOSEN BY IT'S MEMBERS IN AN ANNUAL ELECTION. OPS WORKS TO RAISE AWARENESS OF THE CHARITIES IT SUPPORTS AND THE ISSUES THEY FACE. WE BELIEVE THAT MONEY CAN BE GIVEN MORE EFFECTIVELY AND SUSTAINABLY WHEN THERE IS A STONG LINK BETWEEN DONORS AND BENEFICIARIES.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Bristol City
- India
- Sri Lanka
Governance
- 01 November 2006: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ANNA RAY | Chair | 03 March 2013 |
|
|
||||
Stephen Frost | Trustee | 25 February 2017 |
|
|||||
Mark Frost | Trustee | 19 May 2014 |
|
|||||
Emma Frost | Trustee | 19 May 2014 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £11.28k | £14.21k | £16.46k | £15.07k | £20.85k | |
|
Total expenditure | £10.69k | £14.33k | £15.62k | £15.38k | £17.63k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 14 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 29 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 19 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 03 November 2021 | 3 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 12 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 20/05/2006 AS AMENDED ON 06/08/2006 AS AMENDED ON 23/09/2011
Charitable objects
(1) THE RELIEF OF POVERTY (2.) THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION (3.) THE RELIEF OF THE PHYSICALLY OR MENTALLY DISABLED IN ORDER TO HELP MEET THEIR NEEDS (4.) THE RELIEF OF POVERTY AND FINANCIAL HARDSHIP (5.) THE RELIEF OF UNEMPLOYMENT (6.) THE PRESERVATION AND PROTECTION OF HEALTH (7.) THE PRESERVATION AND CONSERVATION OF THE ENVIRONMENT THESE OBJECTS SHALL BE FURTHERED BY SUPPORTING INITIATIVES THAT ARE APPROVED BY THE MEMBERSHIP OF THE CHARITY BY PROVIDING FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE, HUMAN RESOURCES OR OTHER SUCH ASSISTANCE AS SEEN NECESSARY.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED.
Contact information
- Address:
-
48 Holmes Hill Road
BRISTOL
BS5 7JS
- Phone:
- 07833376279
- Email:
- No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window