OXFORDSHIRE OLDER CHINESE PEOPLE CENTRE (HAPPY PLACE)

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Weekly meeting with activities including singing, keep fit exercise, reading, health talk, lunch, befriending.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Oxfordshire
Governance
- 29 November 2006: Standard registration
No other names
- Care Quality Commission
- Paying staff
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MUK SANG TSE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
KWAI WONG CHEUNG | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
TUNG WAH CHUNG | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
TAK WING CHAN | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £8.56k | £5.38k | £2.36k | £4.14k | £4.21k | |
|
Total expenditure | £8.18k | £3.22k | £3.72k | £5.48k | £4.03k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 01 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 01 October 2024 | 244 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 26 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 17 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 12 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 15 MAY 2006 AS AMENDED 6 NOVEMBER 2006
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE THE NEEDS OF CHINESE OLDER PEOPLE AND THEIR CARERS, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY THOSE WHO ARE DISABLED, IMMOBILE, IN ILL-HEALTH OR THOSE WHO HAVE DIFFICULTIES COMMUNICATING DUE TO THEIR LANGUAGE BARRIER BY: A LIAISING WITH OLDER PEOPLE TO PROMOTE FRIENDSHIP AND UNITY IN ORDER TO REDUCE ISOLATION CAUSED BY LANGUAGE AND CULTURAL BARRIERS; B ORGANISING RECREATIONAL ACTIVITIES AND HEALTH TALKS IN ORDER TO PROMOTE HEALTHY LIVING AND TO DEFER OR PREVENT THE ONSET OF DISABLING CONDITIONS IN OLDER CHINESE PEOPLE; C INVOLVING OLDER CHINESE PEOPLE IN ORGANISING ACTIVITIES AND DECISION MAKING PROCESSES AND D ASSISTING OLDER CHINESE PEOPLE TO BECOME AWARE OF AND HAVE ACCESS TO INFORMATION OF SOCIAL SERVICES AND HEALTH CARE.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, OXFORDSHIRE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
WEST OXFORD COMMUNITY CENTRE
BOTLEY ROAD
OXFORD
OX2 0BT
- Phone:
- 07975 538718
- Email:
- oocpcandoisum@gmail.com
- Website:
-
chineseinoxford.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window