HARINDER VERIAH (UK) TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Supporting disadvantaged schoolchildren in Malaysia
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024
People

9 Trustee(s)
3 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Other Finance
- Malaysia
Governance
- 18 April 2007: Standard registration
No other names
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Isabell Whiteway | Trustee | 31 August 2024 |
|
|
||||
Lawrence Adekoya | Trustee | 31 August 2024 |
|
|
||||
Aneesha Srinivasan | Trustee | 23 July 2020 |
|
|
||||
Freda Urmila Sundram | Trustee | 23 July 2020 |
|
|
||||
Ravi Harinder Veriah Jacques | Trustee | 23 July 2020 |
|
|
||||
ANTHONY JULIAN COLE | Trustee | 23 July 2020 |
|
|
||||
HAIYUAN GUO | Trustee | 23 July 2020 |
|
|
||||
Folashade Adekoya | Trustee | 20 June 2018 |
|
|
||||
MARTIN JACQUES | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2020 | 05/04/2021 | 05/04/2022 | 05/04/2023 | 05/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £19.05k | £28.81k | £8.56k | £22.28k | £14.72k | |
|
Total expenditure | £44.89k | £10.60k | £25.70k | £3.12k | £2.08k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | 29 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | 03 February 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | 05 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2021 | 25 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2021 | 25 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2020 | 18 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATE 2 MARCH 2006 AS AMENDED 12 MARCH 2007.
Charitable objects
2.2 THE OBJECTS ARE: (A) TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF CHILDREN IN THE PETALING JAYA AREA OF MALAYSIA; IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY PROVIDING AND ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION OF EDUCATIONAL FACILITIES; (B) TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF MALAYSIAN CITIZENS FROM UNDER-PRIVILEGED BACKGROUNDS; IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY PROVIDING FUNDING TO THE HARINDER VERIAH TRUST FOR THE ADVANCEMENT OF THIS PURPOSE; AND (C) TO PROMOTE THE HEALTH AND WELFARE OF MALAYSIAN CHILDREN FROM UNDER-PRIVILEGED BACKGROUNDS; IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY PROVIDING FUNDING TO THE HARINDER VERIAH TRUST FOR THE ADVANCEMENT OF THIS PURPOSE. 2.3 THE TRUSTEES MUST USE THE INCOME AND MAY USE THE CAPITAL OF THE CHARITY IN PROMOTING THE OBJECTS.
Area of benefit
THE PETALING JAYA AREA OF MALAYSIA.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Flat 55
The Pryors
East Heath Road
London
NW3 1BP
- Phone:
- 02074357142
- Email:
- martin@martinjacques.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window