Financial history PARKWAY GREEN HOUSING TRUST

Charity Number: 1116258
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2015 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019
Total gross income £25.38m £25.46m £25.02m £29.56m £31.51m
Total expenditure £21.17m £22.10m £19.24m £26.02m £29.10m
Income from government contracts £5.00k £9.00k £9.00k £124.00k £46.00k
Income from government grants £210.00k £280.00k £1.69m £14.00k £55.00k
Income - Donations and legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £24.34m £25.06m £23.85m £27.42m £29.34m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £24.00k £31.00k £52.00k £70.00k £197.00k
Income - Other £1.02m £371.00k £1.12m £2.08m £1.98m
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £21.17m £22.10m £19.24m £26.02m £29.10m
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0