HYDRO 4 HEALTH

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Physio therapist devised excercise in a Hydro therapy pool, 30 minute session weekly. Alternative therapys available Self help group
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2022
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- Amateur Sport
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- East Riding Of Yorkshire
Governance
- 23 August 2006: Standard registration
No other names
- Risk management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ALAN RENSHAW | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Angela Joan Sissons | Trustee | 20 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Susan Warcup | Trustee | 12 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
JANE CHAPMAN | Trustee | 14 April 2013 |
|
|
||||
DOROTHY KIRKUP | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
PHILIP TAFT | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2018 | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £4.96k | £4.38k | £1.78k | £827 | £1.56k | |
|
Total expenditure | £4.55k | £4.38k | £1.78k | £827 | £3.14k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 209 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 209 days | |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 03 April 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 09 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 02 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 16 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 15 FEBRUARY 2006 AS AMENDED 9 AUGUST 2006
Charitable objects
THE RELIEF OF SICKNESS AND THE PRESERVATION AND PROTECTION OF HEALTH BY THE PROVISION OF A HYDROTHERAPY POOL TO ADULTS IN EAST YORKSHIRE
Area of benefit
EAST YORKSHIRE
Contact information
- Address:
-
KINGS MILL SCHOOL
VICTORIA ROAD
DRIFFIELD
YO25 6UG
- Phone:
- 01377 236638
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window