THE ANNIE LENNOX FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Annie Lennox Foundation will have a emphasis on women and children in the context of HIV/AIDS, as well as a general spread of donations covering a wide range of issues from human rights to homelessness.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 January 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Accommodation/housing
- Children/young People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Scotland
- South Africa
Governance
- 22 June 2006: Standard registration
No other names
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ANDREW RONALD STINSON | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
RICHARD JOHN LESLIE HARRIS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
TARA ALEXANDRA GOLDSMID PATERSON | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/01/2020 | 31/01/2021 | 31/01/2022 | 31/01/2023 | 31/01/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £375.83k | £40.39k | £36 | £10.46k | £5.28k | |
|
Total expenditure | £32.36k | £135.05k | £105.01k | £105.07k | £50.01k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 January 2024 | 23 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 January 2023 | 06 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 January 2022 | 20 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 January 2021 | 22 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2021 | 22 September 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 January 2020 | 25 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2020 | 25 September 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED ON 24 JANUARY 2006
Charitable objects
TO FURTHER ANY PURPOSES WHICH ARE CHARITABLE IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE LAW OF ENGLAND AND WALES FROM TIME TO TIME AS THE CHARITY THINKS FIT.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED, IN PRACTICE WORLDWIDE
Contact information
- Address:
-
Unit 4 Jupiter Court
10-12 Tolworth Rise South
Surbiton
Surrey
KT5 9NN
- Phone:
- 0207 801 1961
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window