THAI - UK TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The relief of financial hardship, either generally or individually of people living in Thailand and in the UK by making grants of money for providing or paying for items, services or facilities for the sick and poor.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 October 2023
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Children/young People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Thailand
Governance
- 19 June 2006: Standard registration
- THAI UK TRUST (Previous name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
GEOFFREY LEE TIRRELL | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
PANTIPA TIRRELL | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
DONNA EMMA HARRISON | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/10/2019 | 31/10/2020 | 31/10/2021 | 31/10/2022 | 31/10/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £110 | £43 | £34 | £25 | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £414 | £432 | £450 | £450 | £450 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 October 2023 | 19 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 October 2022 | 22 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 October 2021 | 02 September 2022 | 2 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 October 2020 | 05 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 October 2019 | 26 June 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 30 MAY 2006
Charitable objects
THE RELIEF OF FINANCIAL HARDSHIP, EITHER GENERALLY OR INDIVIDUALLY, OF PEOPLE LIVING IN THAILAND AND IN THE UK BY MAKING GRANTS OF MONEY FOR PROVIDING OR PAYING FOR ITEMS SERVICES OR FACILITIES FOR THE SICK AND POOR LIVING IN THAILAND AND IN THE UK EITHER GENERALLY OR INDIVIDUALLY THROUGH THE PROVISION OF GRANTS OR SERVICES. THE RELIEF OF FINANCIAL NEED AND SUFFERING AMONG VICTIMS OF NATURAL OR OTHER KINDS OF DISASTER IN THE FORM OF MONEY OR OTHER MEANS DEEMED SUITABLE FOR PERSONS, BODIES, ORGANISATIONS AND/OR COUNTRIES AFFECTED.
Area of benefit
THAILAND AND IN THE UK
Contact information
- Address:
-
2 UPLANDS CLOSE
GERRARDS CROSS
SL9 7JH
- Phone:
- 01753880518
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window