LITTLEWORTH CHURCH STAFFORD

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We teach people of all ages Christian Faith and Practice and support them practically and emotionally as needed. We operate regular mutual encouragement groups as well as reaching out to our local community. We have a weekly informal coffee morning which enables contact with local residents and some senior citizens who may not otherwise have such contact.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
4 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Other Charitable Activities
- Staffordshire
Governance
- 12 July 2006: Standard registration
- GRACE CHURCH STAFFORD (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Simon Richard Waddingham | Trustee | 27 January 2019 |
|
|
||||
KEVIN DAVID MORTON | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MATTHEW LAURENCE ROBERT RICHER | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £23.21k | £24.66k | £25.58k | £35.22k | £46.47k | |
|
Total expenditure | £20.13k | £20.59k | £24.79k | £28.49k | £33.08k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 28 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 28 November 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 10 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 10 November 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 25 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 25 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 24 August 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 24 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 8 MARCH 2005
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE CHRISTIAN RELIGION
Area of benefit
LITTLEWORTH, STAFFORD
Contact information
- Address:
-
8 Edmund Avenue
STAFFORD
ST17 9FT
- Phone:
- 07946 404119
- Email:
- lisaricher75.lr@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window