JOHN EASTWOOD HOSPICE TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The charity supports Nottinghamshire Healthcare NHS Foundation Trust in the provision and development of specialist palliative care services.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income:
£998,594
Donations and legacies | £444.90k | |
Charitable activities | £0 | |
Other trading activities | £424.92k | |
Investments | £128.78k | |
Other | £0 |
Total expenditure:
£748,141
Raising funds | £225.87k | |
Charitable activities | £522.27k | |
Other | £0 |
£343,543 investments gains (losses)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £225.87k | |
Charitable expenditure | £522.27k | |
Retained for future use | £250.45k |
Raising funds and other expenditure | £225.87k | |
Charitable expenditure | £522.27k | |
Retained for future use | £594.00k |
People

10 Employee(s)
10 Trustee(s)
92 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Other Charitable Activities
- Derbyshire
- Nottinghamshire
Governance
- 15 January 2007: Standard registration
- 24 February 2023: Funds received from 507238 THE PENTECOSTAL EVENTIDE TRUST
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
PATRICIA TOOTELL | Chair | 16 August 2017 |
|
|||||
Victoria Preston | Trustee | 14 August 2024 |
|
|||||
Gemma Gilbert | Trustee | 08 May 2024 |
|
|||||
Kenneth Robinson | Trustee | 08 May 2024 |
|
|||||
Anne Haywood | Trustee | 07 February 2024 |
|
|||||
CHRISTA BURGESS | Trustee | 07 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Steven Kerr | Trustee | 01 February 2023 |
|
|||||
Gary Michael Jordan | Trustee | 02 November 2022 |
|
|||||
Alan Haggerty | Trustee | 03 August 2022 |
|
|||||
Dr Donald Harradine | Trustee | 07 November 2018 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £688.43k | £1.02m | £1.05m | £1.10m | £998.59k | |
|
Total expenditure | £499.39k | £622.25k | £569.49k | £657.80k | £748.14k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £54.29k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £445.27k | £880.59k | £632.54k | £589.40k | £444.90k | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £0 | £0 | £0 | £398.07k | £424.92k | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £156.11k | £72.07k | £339.41k | £5.80k | £0 | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | £87.05k | £71.67k | £78.49k | £106.07k | £128.78k | |
|
Income - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | £648.96k | £435.76k | £379.97k | £278.81k | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £391.92k | £496.74k | £402.94k | £464.76k | £522.27k | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £107.48k | £125.52k | £166.55k | £193.04k | £225.87k | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £0 | £496.74k | £402.94k | £6.00k | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | £28.11k | £34.28k | £36.06k | £36.40k | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £3.67m | £3.76m | £3.67m | £3.58m | £3.44m | |
|
Long-term investments | £3.38m | £4.48m | £5.02m | £5.26m | £5.90m | |
|
Other assets | £263.01k | £276.64k | £404.82k | £316.23k | £406.52k | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | £9.70k | £9.15k | £9.15k | £10.31k | £10.90k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 07 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 07 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 15 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 15 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 10 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 10 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 17 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 18 November 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 12 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 12 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 26 MAY 2006 AS AMENDED BY WRITTEN RESOLUTION DATED 22 AUGUST 2006
Charitable objects
(A) TO PAY OR APPLY THE INCOME OF THE COMPANY AND THE WHOLE OR SUCH PART OR PARTS OF THE CAPITAL OF THE COMPANY AS SHALL FROM TIME TO TIME BE DEEMED APPROPRIATE FOR THE RELIEF OF AGED IMPOTENT AND POOR PERSONS OF THE DISTRICTS OF MANSFIELD, ASHFIELD AND NEWARK AND SHERWOOD OR ELSEWHERE WHO SHALL BE SUFFERING FROM CANCER OR ANY TERMINAL ILLNESS IN ANY MANNER WHICH SHALL BE DEEMED CHARITABLE BY LAW. (B) (I) TO SUPPORT THE ASHFIELD PRIMARY CARE TRUST ("THE NHS TRUST") OR ANY SUCCESSOR BODY HAVING RESPONSIBILITY FOR THE PROVISION OF PALLIATIVE CARE SERVICES IN THE AREA SERVED BY THE NHS TRUST, IN THE ORGANISATION AND DELIVERY OF PALLIATIVE CARE SERVICES BOTH IN THE "JOHN EASTWOOD HOSPICE" ("THE HOSPICE") AND IN THE COMMUNITY BY: - THE RECRUITMENT, TRAINING AND ORGANISATION OF A TEAM OF VOLUNTEERS TO SUPPORT AND SUPPLEMENT THE PROFESSIONAL CARE STAFF IN THE HOSPICE AND THE COMMUNITY IN ORDER TO ENHANCE THE ENVIRONMENT AND QUALITY OF LIFE FOR PATIENTS AND THEIR FAMILIES, - THE PROVISION OF RESOURCES SO AS TO ENABLE PATIENTS AND THEIR FAMILIES TO RECEIVE THOSE ADDITIONAL AND/OR SUPERIOR SERVICES AND SUPPORT WHICH MAY FROM TIME TO TIME NOT BE PROVIDED BY THE NHS TRUST OR ITS SUCCESSOR. (II) TO DEVELOP, EXTEND AND IMPROVE THE FACILITIES AND SERVICES AVAILABLE BOTH WITHIN THE HOSPICE AND THE COMMUNITY FOR THE BENEFIT OF PATIENTS AND THEIR FAMILIES. (III) TO SUPPORT AND ENCOURAGE EDUCATION AND TRAINING FOR THOSE ENGAGED IN THE ORGANISATION, DELIVERY AND SUPPORT OF PALLIATIVE CARE SERVICES BOTH WITHIN THE HOSPICE AND IN THE COMMUNITY.
Area of benefit
MANSFIELD, ASHFIELD, NEWARK AND SHERWOOD.
Contact information
- Address:
-
JOHN EASTWOOD HOSPICE
MANSFIELD ROAD
SUTTON-IN-ASHFIELD
NG17 4HJ
- Phone:
- 01623622626
- Email:
- tracey.joyce@nottshc.nhs.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window