Financial history IGNITION GLOUCESTERSHIRE

Charity number: 1115733
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023 31/12/2024
Total gross income £1 £0 £15.61k £31.14k £42.72k
Total expenditure £0 £0 £16.15k £28.33k £36.41k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A