THE OXFORD CENTRE FOR BUDDHIST STUDIES

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The OCBS: 1 promotes/supports teaching/research on Buddhist texts, social forms & history (including interdisciplinary work): a) in Oxford University; & b) in collaborations based in Oxford 2. collaborates with So-Wide to: a) raise funds for posts/bursaries in Buddhist Studies at Oxford University; & b) run University Extension courses for non-Oxford students & the general public
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

9 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Oxfordshire
Governance
- 29 June 2006: Standard registration
- 10 January 2025: Funds received from 1104059 THE SOCIETY FOR THE WIDER UNDERSTANDING OF THE BUD...
- OCBS (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Charles Michael Mowat Shaw | Chair | 17 March 2020 |
|
|
||||
Dr Justin Otzen Meiland | Trustee | 21 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Professor Ramesh Babubhai Kapadia | Trustee | 26 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Dr Jonathan Bernard Katz | Trustee | 27 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Dr Roger Farmer | Trustee | 27 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
PROF DAVID NICHOLAS GELLNER | Trustee | 25 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
Dr Tony Morris | Trustee | 22 October 2015 |
|
|
||||
VENERABLE KHAMMAI DHAMMASAMI | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
PROFESSOR R F GOMBRICH | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £48.95k | £89.83k | £44.49k | £32.78k | £205.91k | |
|
Total expenditure | £101.53k | £70.59k | £73.83k | £77.66k | £57.36k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 09 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 09 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 24 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 24 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 23 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 23 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 26 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 26 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 29 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 29 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 1 JUNE 2006
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC BY HOLDING AND ADMINISTERING FUNDS FOR PERMANENT AND TEMPORARY TEACHING POSTS, AND TEMPORARY RESEARCH POSTS, IN BUDDHIST STUDIES AT OXFORD UNIVERSITY; BY THE ADMINISTRATION OF TEACHING AND RESEARCH ACTIVITIES IN BUDDHIST STUDIES UNDERTAKEN BY OXFORD UNIVERSITY; AND BY AGREEING ARRANGEMENTS FOR COLLABORATION IN RESPECT OF BUDDHIST STUDIES TEACHING AND RESEARCH WITH THE UNIVERSITY OF OXFORD (AND COLLEGES, FACULTIES AND DEPARTMENTS WITHIN IT), AND WITH OTHER ORGANISATIONS INVOLVED IN GENERATING AND DIFFUSING ACADEMICALLY SOUND INFORMATION ABOUT THE BUDDHIST TRADITION.
Area of benefit
OXFORD
Contact information
- Address:
-
John Eccles House
Robert Robinson Avenue
Oxford Science Park
OXFORD
OX4 4GP
- Phone:
- 01865274098
- Email:
- steven.egan@ocbs.org
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window