FLUXUS ART PROJECTS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Fluxus Art Projects is a Franco-British charity dedicated to supporting emerging visual artists and curators from both France and the UK.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 October 2023
People

11 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout England And Wales
- France
- Northern Ireland
- Scotland
Governance
- 31 August 2006: Standard registration
- PARIS CALLING LIMITED (Previous name)
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Helene Nguyen Ban | Chair | 23 May 2022 |
|
|
||||||||||
Coline Milliard | Trustee | 16 December 2024 |
|
|
||||||||||
James Lingwood | Trustee | 23 June 2023 |
|
|||||||||||
Eva Langret | Trustee | 23 June 2023 |
|
|||||||||||
Maxime Hennequet | Trustee | 16 January 2020 |
|
|
||||||||||
Laurent Louis Volker Issaurat | Trustee | 14 December 2016 |
|
|
||||||||||
Anne Arianne Pierre D'ALBIS GANEM | Trustee | 12 May 2016 |
|
|
||||||||||
Veronique Marie Francoise Paule Nic Parke | Trustee | 12 May 2016 |
|
|
||||||||||
Elisabeth Ruth Carey-Thomas | Trustee | 01 June 2010 |
|
|
||||||||||
JEAN-CONRAD LEMAITRE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||||||
RICHARD FAIRBAIRN | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/10/2019 | 31/10/2020 | 31/10/2021 | 31/10/2022 | 31/10/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £105.05k | £146.53k | £100.66k | £145.82k | £114.06k | |
|
Total expenditure | £84.84k | £108.66k | £94.98k | £124.90k | £190.79k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 October 2023 | 30 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2023 | 30 August 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2022 | 28 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2022 | 28 July 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2021 | 31 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2021 | 31 August 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2020 | 22 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2020 | 22 July 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2019 | 21 July 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2019 | 21 July 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 11/05/2006 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 04/12/2008 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 13/01/2015
Charitable objects
(1)TO CARRY ON ALL OR ANY OF THE BUSINESS OF PROMOTERS AND THE PROMOTION OF CHARITIES, CHARITABLE CAUSES AND PROFESSIONS OF ANY AND EVERY DESCRIPTION, TO ACT AS CONSULTANTS, PROMOTERS AND ORGANISERS OF SOCIAL, RELIGIOUS, EDUCATIONAL, SPORTING AND SCIENTIFIC ACTIVITIES, ART AND COMMERCE AND ANYTHING INCIDENTAL OR CONDUCIVE TO ANY OF THE ABOVE. (2) TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN THE SUBJECT OF ALL FORMS OF CONTEMPORARY ART. (3) TO PROMOTE ALL FORMS OF CONTEMPORARY ART FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC BY PROVIDING SUPPORT ASSISTANCE AND MAINTENANCE FOR ALL ARTISTIC VENUES
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED.
Contact information
- Address:
-
The French Embassy
Cultural Department
23 Cromwell Road
London
SW7 2EL
- Phone:
- 0207 0731 342
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window