THE CHRISTIAN DANCE FELLOWSHIP OF BRITAIN

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Furthering the CDFB's charitable objects by providing fellowship, & supporting all areas of dance ministry. Reaching others with our message through dance. To build an understanding of the theology & ministry of dance and to promote its use as part of the Church's life. To be a positive Christian presence within the dance community, and to support Christians working as dancers in the dance world.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 April 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
50 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Religious Activities
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout England And Wales
- Scotland
Governance
- 03 July 2006: Standard registration
No other names
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Jane Grimshaw | Chair | 05 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Jacqueline Turner | Trustee | 05 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Jacqueline Haywood | Trustee | 05 October 2024 |
|
|||||
Paul Haywood | Trustee | 26 September 2020 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/04/2020 | 30/04/2021 | 30/04/2022 | 30/04/2023 | 30/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £11.29k | £8.16k | £4.46k | £9.70k | £24.19k | |
|
Total expenditure | £8.93k | £6.77k | £4.06k | £7.78k | £25.21k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 April 2024 | 16 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 April 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 April 2022 | 23 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 April 2021 | 24 February 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 April 2020 | 23 February 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 27 MAY 2005
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE CHRISTIAN RELIGION AND IN PARTICULAR THROUGH THE MINISTRY AND ART OF DANCE, TO GLORIFY GOD AND EXALT JESUS, SERVING THE BODY OF CHRIST AND PREPARING THE CHURCH OF CHRIST FOR HIS RETURN.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
19 Hoylake Drive
Mickleover
DERBY
DE3 0QA
- Phone:
- 07826 905511
- Email:
- info@cdfb.org.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window