PAKISTAN FORUM NOTTINGHAM

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Charity organize various gatherings though-out the year including Musical programmes, Poetry events, Lunch Clubs, Independence day celebrations etc
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2023
People

4 Trustee(s)
9 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Economic/community Development/employment
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Nottinghamshire
Governance
- 06 September 2007: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
AZHAR RAOOF | Trustee | 05 March 2024 |
|
|||||
Shahid Shariff | Trustee | 05 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Mohammed Munir | Trustee | 05 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
ZAHID MIRZA | Trustee | 20 May 2012 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2019 | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £14.61k | £3.35k | £1.36k | £2.17k | £13.48k | |
|
Total expenditure | £13.50k | £2.54k | £1.30k | £4.93k | £13.12k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 89 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 89 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 19 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 15 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 10 February 2021 | 10 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 2 AUGUST 2007.
Charitable objects
3. AIMS AND OBJECTS. (1) TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE INHABITANTS OF NOTTINGHAMSHIRE, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY MEMBERS OF THE PAKISTANI COMMUNITY IN CULTURE, HERITAGE, HISTORY, LANGUAGES AND SKILLS WHICH ENHANCE EMPLOYMENT; (2) TO PROMOTE GOOD RELATIONS BETWEEN PERSONS OF DIFFERENT RACIAL GROUPS; (3) TO RELIEVE FINANCIAL HARDSHIP EITHER GENERALLY OR INDIVIDUALLY OF PEOPLE LIVING IN NOTTINGHAMSHIRE; (4) TO PROVIDE OR ASSIST IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION OR OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION OF INDIVIDUALS WHO HAVE NEED OF SUCH FACILITIES BY REASON OF THEIR YOUTH, AGE, INFIRMITY OR DISABILITY, FINANCIAL HARDSHIP OR SOCIAL CIRCUMSTANCES WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE; (5) TO CARRY OUT ANY CHARITABLE PURPOSE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF NOTTINGHAMSHIRE THAT THE TRUSTEES, FROM TIME TO TIME, MAY THINK FIT.
Area of benefit
NOTTINGHAMSHIRE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Pakistan Forum Nottingham
c/o Excelsior Suites Ltd
5 Lortas Road
NOTTINGHAM
NG5 1EL
- Phone:
- 0115 7100303
- Email:
- admin@pakistanforum.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window