FABRIC- FORUM FOR THE ARTS IN BRADFORD LTD
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Fabric provides a forum through which to advance the education of people in Bradford and surrounding areas in all forms of the arts and creative activity. We do this by providing information, training, support, advice and advocacy services to those persons and organisations involved in the social, cultural and creative regeneration of Bradford and surrounding areas.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2013
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Bradford City
Governance
- 28 July 2006: Standard registration
- 24 September 2018: Removed (Does not operate)
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2009 | 31/03/2010 | 31/03/2011 | 31/03/2012 | 31/03/2013 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £176.66k | £248.20k | £343.38k | £141.98k | £175.66k | |
|
Total expenditure | £165.63k | £223.72k | £324.66k | £214.21k | £188.63k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2018 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2018 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2017 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2017 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2016 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2016 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2015 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2015 | Not submitted |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 6 MAY 2005
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THOSE PERSONS LIVING OR WORKING IN BRADFORD AND SURROUNDING AREAS (THE 'AREA OF BENEFIT') IN ALL FORMS OF THE ARTS AND CREATIVE ACTIVITY AND THEREBY ENCOURAGING A WIDER APPRECIATION OF VISUAL AND PERFORMING ARTS, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY PROVIDING A COMMUNITY FORUM PROMOTING INFORMATION, TRAINING, SUPPORT, ADVICE AND ADVOCACY SERVICES TO THOSE PERSONS AND ORGANISATIONS INVOLVED IN THE SOCIAL, CULTURAL AND CREATIVE REGENERATION OF THE AREA OF BENEFIT.
Area of benefit
BRADFORD AND SURROUNDING AREAS
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window