ANXIETY ALLIANCE
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To offer support and offer self help to those who suffer from anxiety disorders,panic attacks and obsessive compulsive disorder, together with help for their carers. Those who wish to withdraw from tranquilliser and anti-depressants. Help and support to be provided for their carers, family and friends.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 March 2015
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
- Northern Ireland
- Scotland
Governance
- 11 July 2006: Standard registration
- 09 September 2017: Removed (Does not operate)
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/03/2011 | 30/03/2012 | 30/03/2013 | 30/03/2014 | 30/03/2015 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £3.93k | £2.42k | £1.58k | £18.69k | £3.80k | |
|
Total expenditure | £6.31k | £4.80k | £3.71k | £8.25k | £3.19k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 March 2017 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 30 March 2017 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 30 March 2016 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 30 March 2016 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 30 March 2015 | 27 January 2016 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 March 2015 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 March 2014 | 07 November 2014 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 March 2014 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION DATED 27 APRIL 2006
Charitable objects
TO OFFER SUPPORT AND OFFER SELF-HELP TO THOSE WHO SUFFER FROM ANXIETY DISORDERS, PANIC ATTACKS AND OBSESSIVE COMPULSIVE DISORDER, TOGETHER WITH THOSE WHO WISH TO WITHDRAW FROM TRANQUILLISER AND ANTI-DEPRESSANTS. HELP AND SUPPORT TO BE PROVIDED FOR THEIR CARERS, FAMILY AND FRIENDS
Area of benefit
NATIONAL
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window