Accounts and annual returns TWEENIE TOTS 2 PLAYGROUP

Charity number: 1115898
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 May 2011 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2011 Not submitted
Annual return 31 May 2010 19 October 2010 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2010 25 October 2010 On Time
Annual return 31 May 2009 12 November 2009 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2009 12 November 2009 On Time
Annual return 31 May 2008 09 March 2009 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2008 31 March 2009 On Time